Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1445 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 7, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 9, 2021
Fiscal Note March 19, 2021
Fiscal Note March 13, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 8, 2021
Analysis March 24, 2021