1 | | - | H.B. No. 1456 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Herrero (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 1456 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local |
---|
| 4 | + | Government; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 21, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1456 By: Zaffirini |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the expiration of the health care provider |
---|
6 | 14 | | participation program administered and operated by the Nueces |
---|
7 | 15 | | County Hospital District. |
---|
8 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Section 298C.004, Health and Safety Code, as |
---|
10 | 18 | | added by Chapter 694 (S.B. 2315), Acts of the 86th Legislature, |
---|
11 | 19 | | Regular Session, 2019, is repealed. |
---|
12 | 20 | | SECTION 2. Section 2, Chapter 694 (S.B. 2315), Acts of the |
---|
13 | 21 | | 86th Legislature, Regular Session, 2019, is repealed. |
---|
14 | 22 | | SECTION 3. To the extent of any conflict, this Act prevails |
---|
15 | 23 | | over another Act of the 87th Legislature, Regular Session, 2021, |
---|
16 | 24 | | relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted |
---|
17 | 25 | | codes. |
---|
18 | 26 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
19 | 27 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
20 | 28 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
21 | 29 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
22 | 30 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
23 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
24 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
25 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1456 was passed by the House on April |
---|
26 | | - | 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 111, Nays 30, 2 present, not |
---|
27 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
28 | | - | No. 1456 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 110, Nays 35, |
---|
29 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
30 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
31 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
32 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1456 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
33 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
34 | | - | 0. |
---|
35 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
36 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
37 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
38 | | - | Date |
---|
39 | | - | __________________ |
---|
40 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 31 | + | * * * * * |
---|