Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1456 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 23, 2021
Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis April 16, 2021