House
|
05/30/2021
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA11 Kolkhorst
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA10 Paxton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA9 Hughes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA8 Eckhardt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA7 Lucio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA6 Bettencourt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA5 Bettencourt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA4 Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1468 Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Record vote RV#497
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Amended 2-Burrows
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Amended 1-K. King
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|