Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1468 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 24, 2021
Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 23, 2021
Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021