House | 04/29/2021 | Record vote RV#522 | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Record vote RV#521 | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Vote reconsidered | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Failed to pass to engrossment | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Record vote RV#513 | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Point of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 1(b) | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Record vote RV#512 | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Amended 1-C. Turner | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2021 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | ||
House | 03/05/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 01/29/2021 | Filed |