Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1485 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 18, 2021
Fiscal Note March 16, 2021