Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1497 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 27, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 14, 2021
Fiscal Note April 9, 2021