Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1554 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill March 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note March 16, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021