House
|
05/10/2021
|
Postponed 6/1/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 8-Martinez Fischer
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Record vote RV#919
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Amended 7-Tinderholt
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Record vote RV#918
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Amended 6-Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Record vote RV#917
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Amendment as amended fails of adoption 4-Tinderholt
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Amendment amended 5-Tinderholt
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 4-Tinderholt
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Amended 3-Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 2-Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Record vote RV#916
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Amended 1-Tinderholt
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Postponed 5/10/21 9:45 AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|