Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1570 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 23, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021