Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1570 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 1570
1+By: Paddie (Senate Sponsor - Hall) H.B. No. 1570
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 21, 2021;
3+ May 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
4+ Resources & Economic Development; May 19, 2021, reported favorably
5+ by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2021, sent to
6+ printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
28
39
10+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
411 AN ACT
512 relating to the Brazos River Authority, following recommendations
613 of the Sunset Advisory Commission; specifying grounds for the
714 removal of a member of the board of directors.
815 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
916 SECTION 1. Section 8502.0021(a), Special District Local
1017 Laws Code, is amended to read as follows:
1118 (a) The authority is subject to review under Chapter 325,
1219 Government Code (Texas Sunset Act), but may not be abolished under
1320 that chapter. The review shall be conducted under Section 325.025,
1421 Government Code, as if the authority were a state agency scheduled
1522 to be abolished September 1, 2033 [2021], and every 12th year after
1623 that year.
1724 SECTION 2. Chapter 8502, Special District Local Laws Code,
1825 is amended by adding Sections 8502.0091, 8502.0092, 8502.0093,
1926 8502.0094, and 8502.0095 to read as follows:
2027 Sec. 8502.0091. GROUNDS FOR REMOVAL OF DIRECTORS. (a) It
2128 is a ground for removal from the board that a director:
2229 (1) does not have at the time of taking office the
2330 qualifications required by Section 8502.009;
2431 (2) does not maintain during service on the board the
2532 qualifications required by Section 8502.009;
2633 (3) is ineligible for directorship under Chapter 171,
2734 Local Government Code;
2835 (4) cannot, because of illness or disability,
2936 discharge the director's duties for a substantial part of the
3037 director's term; or
3138 (5) is absent from more than half of the regularly
3239 scheduled board meetings that the director is eligible to attend
3340 during a calendar year without an excuse approved by a majority vote
3441 of the board.
3542 (b) The validity of an action of the board is not affected by
3643 the fact that it is taken when a ground for removal of a director
3744 exists.
3845 (c) If the general manager has knowledge that a potential
3946 ground for removal exists, the general manager shall notify the
4047 presiding officer of the board of the potential ground. The
4148 presiding officer shall then notify the governor and the attorney
4249 general that a potential ground for removal exists. If the
4350 potential ground for removal involves the presiding officer, the
4451 general manager shall notify the next highest ranking director, who
4552 shall then notify the governor and the attorney general that a
4653 potential ground for removal exists.
4754 Sec. 8502.0092. DIRECTOR TRAINING. (a) A person who is
4855 appointed to and qualifies for office as a director may not vote,
4956 deliberate, or be counted as a director in attendance at a board
5057 meeting until the person completes a training program that complies
5158 with this section.
5259 (b) The training program must provide the person with
5360 information regarding:
5461 (1) the law governing authority operations;
5562 (2) the programs, functions, rules, and budget of the
5663 authority;
5764 (3) the scope of and limitations on the rulemaking
5865 authority of the authority;
5966 (4) the results of the most recent formal audit of the
6067 authority;
6168 (5) the requirements of:
6269 (A) laws relating to open meetings, public
6370 information, administrative procedure, and disclosure of conflicts
6471 of interest; and
6572 (B) other laws applicable to members of the
6673 governing body of a river authority in performing their duties; and
6774 (6) any applicable ethics policies adopted by the
6875 authority or the Texas Ethics Commission.
6976 (c) A person appointed to the board is entitled to
7077 reimbursement for the travel expenses incurred in attending the
7178 training program regardless of whether the attendance at the
7279 program occurs before or after the person qualifies for office.
7380 (d) The general manager of the authority shall create a
7481 training manual that includes the information required by
7582 Subsection (b). The general manager shall distribute a copy of the
7683 training manual annually to each director. Each director shall
7784 sign and submit to the general manager a statement acknowledging
7885 that the director received and has reviewed the training manual.
7986 Sec. 8502.0093. POLICIES TO SEPARATE POLICY-MAKING AND
8087 STAFF FUNCTIONS. The board shall develop and implement policies
8188 that clearly separate the policy-making responsibilities of the
8289 board and the management responsibilities of the general manager
8390 and the staff of the authority.
8491 Sec. 8502.0094. COMPLAINTS. (a) The authority shall
8592 maintain a system to promptly and efficiently act on complaints
8693 filed with the authority. The authority shall maintain information
8794 about parties to the complaint, the subject matter of the
8895 complaint, a summary of the results of the review or investigation
8996 of the complaint, and its disposition.
9097 (b) The authority shall make information describing its
9198 procedures for complaint investigation and resolution available to
9299 the public.
93100 (c) The authority shall periodically notify the complaint
94101 parties of the status of the complaint until final disposition
95102 unless the notice would jeopardize an investigation.
96103 Sec. 8502.0095. PUBLIC TESTIMONY. The board shall develop
97104 and implement policies that provide the public with a reasonable
98105 opportunity to appear before the board and to speak on any issue
99106 under the jurisdiction of the authority.
100107 SECTION 3. Notwithstanding Section 8502.0092, Special
101108 District Local Laws Code, as added by this Act, a person serving on
102109 the board of directors of the Brazos River Authority may vote,
103110 deliberate, and be counted as a director in attendance at a meeting
104111 of the board until December 1, 2021.
105112 SECTION 4. (a) The legal notice of the intention to
106113 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
107114 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
108115 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
109116 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
110117 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
111118 Government Code.
112119 (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has
113120 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
114121 Environmental Quality.
115122 (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
116123 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
117124 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
118125 representatives within the required time.
119126 (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
120127 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
121128 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
122129 and accomplished.
123130 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
124- ______________________________ ______________________________
125- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
126- I certify that H.B. No. 1570 was passed by the House on April
127- 21, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not
128- voting.
129- ______________________________
130- Chief Clerk of the House
131- I certify that H.B. No. 1570 was passed by the Senate on May
132- 21, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
133- ______________________________
134- Secretary of the Senate
135- APPROVED: _____________________
136- Date
137- _____________________
138- Governor
131+ * * * * *