Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1571 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2021

                    By: Muñoz, Jr. (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 1571
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2021;
 April 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 10, 2021, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; May 10, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1571 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an exemption for certain cemeteries from cemetery
 location restrictions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 711.008, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (l) to read as follows:
 (l)  Subsection (a) does not apply to a cemetery established
 and operating before September 1, 2023, in a municipality:
 (1)  with a population of not less than 75,000 and not
 more than 95,000; and
 (2)  in which a state veterans cemetery is located.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *