1 | | - | H.B. No. 1571 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Muñoz, Jr. (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 1571 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Business & Commerce; May 10, 2021, reported adversely, with |
---|
| 5 | + | favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, |
---|
| 6 | + | Nays 0; May 10, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1571 By: Hancock |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to an exemption for certain cemeteries from cemetery |
---|
6 | 14 | | location restrictions. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 711.008, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
9 | 17 | | amended by adding Subsection (l) to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | (l) Subsection (a) does not apply to a cemetery established |
---|
11 | 19 | | and operating before September 1, 2023, in a municipality: |
---|
12 | 20 | | (1) with a population of not less than 75,000 and not |
---|
13 | 21 | | more than 95,000; and |
---|
14 | 22 | | (2) in which a state veterans cemetery is located. |
---|
15 | 23 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
16 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
17 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
18 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1571 was passed by the House on April |
---|
19 | | - | 9, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 1, 2 present, not |
---|
20 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
21 | | - | No. 1571 on May 20, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, |
---|
22 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
23 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
24 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
25 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1571 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
26 | | - | amendments, on May 17, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
27 | | - | 0. |
---|
28 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
29 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
30 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
31 | | - | Date |
---|
32 | | - | __________________ |
---|
33 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 24 | + | * * * * * |
---|