Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1571 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note May 6, 2021
Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note March 24, 2021
Fiscal Note March 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 7, 2021
Analysis April 30, 2021
Analysis March 29, 2021