Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1571 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/20/2021

                    H.B. No. 1571


 AN ACT
 relating to an exemption for certain cemeteries from cemetery
 location restrictions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 711.008, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (l) to read as follows:
 (l)  Subsection (a) does not apply to a cemetery established
 and operating before September 1, 2023, in a municipality:
 (1)  with a population of not less than 75,000 and not
 more than 95,000; and
 (2)  in which a state veterans cemetery is located.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1571 was passed by the House on April
 9, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 143, Nays 1, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1571 on May 20, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 142, Nays 0,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1571 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 17, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor