Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1576 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/04/2021

                    By: Parker H.B. No. 1576


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a work group on blockchain matters
 concerning this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Blockchain" includes digital assets, virtual
 currency, and the integration of smart contracts.
 (2)  "Work group" means the work group on blockchain
 matters established under this section.
 (b)  The work group on blockchain matters is composed of the
 following 16 members:
 (1)  one member of the house of representatives
 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives;
 (2)  one member of the senate appointed by the
 lieutenant governor;
 (3)  two members representing institutions of higher
 education appointed by the governor;
 (4)  one ex-officio member representing the Department
 of Information Resources appointed by the governor;
 (5)  one ex-officio member representing the secretary
 of state appointed by the governor; and
 (6)  10 members of the public, five of whom are
 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives and five of
 whom are appointed by the lieutenant governor, who:
 (A)  have knowledge and experience in blockchain
 technology; or
 (B)  represent an industry that would benefit from
 the use of blockchain technology.
 (c)  The governor shall designate a member of the work group
 appointed under Subsection (b)(3) of this section to serve as chair
 of the work group. The members of the work group appointed under
 Subsections (b)(1) and (2) of this section shall serve as co-vice
 chairs of the work group.
 (d)  A member of the work group may not receive compensation
 for serving on the work group but is entitled to reimbursement for
 expenses incurred by the member in the performance of official
 duties as a member of the work group as provided by the General
 Appropriations Act.
 (e)  The work group shall meet at the call of the chair.
 (f)  The work group shall develop a master plan for the
 expansion of the blockchain industry in this state and recommend
 policies and state investments in connection with blockchain
 technology. In developing the master plan, the work group shall:
 (1)  identify economic growth and development
 opportunities presented by blockchain technology;
 (2)  assess the existing blockchain industry in this
 state;
 (3)  review workforce needs and academic programs
 required to build blockchain expertise across all relevant
 industries; and
 (4)  make any legislative recommendations that will
 help promote innovation and economic growth by reducing barriers to
 and expediting the expansion of the state's blockchain industry
 based on its findings under Subdivisions (1)-(3) of this
 subsection.
 (g)  The chair of the work group may create sub-work groups
 at the chair's discretion for the efficient operation of the work
 group. The chair shall appoint the chair of each sub-work group.
 The chair of a sub-work group may invite other members of the work
 group to serve on the sub-work group. A sub-work group may consult
 with subject matter experts.
 (h)  Not later than October 31, 2022, the work group shall
 submit a report that includes the master plan developed under
 Subsection (f) of this section and any findings and recommendations
 from the sub-work groups appointed under Subsection (g) of this
 section to each standing committee of the senate and house of
 representatives with primary jurisdiction over economic
 development or technology issues.
 (i)  The work group may adopt rules, procedures, and policies
 as necessary to administer this section and implement the
 responsibilities of the work group.
 (j)  This Act expires and the work group is abolished June
 30, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable, but not later than
 October 1, 2021, the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of
 the house of representatives shall appoint the members of the work
 group on blockchain matters established by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than November 1, 2021, the work group
 on blockchain matters shall hold its initial meeting.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.