4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the creation of a work group on blockchain matters |
---|
6 | 14 | | concerning this state. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. (a) In this section: |
---|
9 | 17 | | (1) "Blockchain" includes digital assets, virtual |
---|
10 | 18 | | currency, and the integration of smart contracts. |
---|
11 | 19 | | (2) "Work group" means the work group on blockchain |
---|
12 | 20 | | matters established under this section. |
---|
13 | 21 | | (b) The work group on blockchain matters is composed of the |
---|
14 | 22 | | following 16 members: |
---|
15 | 23 | | (1) one member of the house of representatives |
---|
16 | 24 | | appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives; |
---|
17 | 25 | | (2) one member of the senate appointed by the |
---|
18 | 26 | | lieutenant governor; |
---|
19 | 27 | | (3) two members representing institutions of higher |
---|
20 | 28 | | education appointed by the governor; |
---|
21 | 29 | | (4) one ex-officio member representing the Department |
---|
22 | 30 | | of Information Resources appointed by the governor; |
---|
23 | 31 | | (5) one ex-officio member representing the secretary |
---|
24 | 32 | | of state appointed by the governor; and |
---|
25 | 33 | | (6) 10 members of the public, five of whom are |
---|
26 | 34 | | appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives and five of |
---|
27 | 35 | | whom are appointed by the lieutenant governor, who: |
---|
28 | 36 | | (A) have knowledge and experience in blockchain |
---|
29 | 37 | | technology; or |
---|
30 | 38 | | (B) represent an industry that would benefit from |
---|
31 | 39 | | the use of blockchain technology. |
---|
32 | 40 | | (c) The governor shall designate a member of the work group |
---|
33 | 41 | | appointed under Subsection (b)(3) of this section to serve as chair |
---|
34 | 42 | | of the work group. The members of the work group appointed under |
---|
35 | 43 | | Subsections (b)(1) and (2) of this section shall serve as co-vice |
---|
36 | 44 | | chairs of the work group. |
---|
37 | 45 | | (d) A member of the work group may not receive compensation |
---|
38 | 46 | | for serving on the work group but is entitled to reimbursement for |
---|
39 | 47 | | expenses incurred by the member in the performance of official |
---|
40 | 48 | | duties as a member of the work group as provided by the General |
---|
41 | 49 | | Appropriations Act. |
---|
42 | 50 | | (e) The Department of Information Resources shall provide |
---|
43 | 51 | | to the work group the administrative support necessary to implement |
---|
44 | 52 | | this Act. |
---|
45 | 53 | | (f) The work group shall meet at the call of the chair. |
---|
46 | 54 | | (g) The work group shall develop a master plan for the |
---|
47 | 55 | | expansion of the blockchain industry in this state and recommend |
---|
48 | 56 | | policies and state investments in connection with blockchain |
---|
49 | 57 | | technology. In developing the master plan, the work group shall: |
---|
50 | 58 | | (1) identify economic growth and development |
---|
51 | 59 | | opportunities presented by blockchain technology; |
---|
52 | 60 | | (2) assess the existing blockchain industry in this |
---|
53 | 61 | | state; |
---|
54 | 62 | | (3) review workforce needs and academic programs |
---|
55 | 63 | | required to build blockchain expertise across all relevant |
---|
56 | 64 | | industries; and |
---|
57 | 65 | | (4) make any legislative recommendations that will |
---|
58 | 66 | | help promote innovation and economic growth by reducing barriers to |
---|
59 | 67 | | and expediting the expansion of the state's blockchain industry |
---|
60 | 68 | | based on its findings under Subdivisions (1)-(3) of this |
---|
61 | 69 | | subsection. |
---|
62 | 70 | | (h) The chair of the work group may create sub-work groups |
---|
63 | 71 | | at the chair's discretion for the efficient operation of the work |
---|
64 | 72 | | group. The chair shall appoint the chair of each sub-work group. |
---|
65 | 73 | | The chair of a sub-work group may invite other members of the work |
---|
66 | 74 | | group to serve on the sub-work group. A sub-work group may consult |
---|
67 | 75 | | with subject matter experts. |
---|
68 | 76 | | (i) Not later than October 31, 2022, the work group shall |
---|
69 | 77 | | submit a report that includes the master plan developed under |
---|
70 | 78 | | Subsection (g) of this section and any findings and recommendations |
---|
71 | 79 | | from the sub-work groups appointed under Subsection (h) of this |
---|
72 | 80 | | section to each standing committee of the senate and house of |
---|
73 | 81 | | representatives with primary jurisdiction over economic |
---|
74 | 82 | | development or technology issues. |
---|
75 | 83 | | (j) The work group may adopt rules, procedures, and policies |
---|
76 | 84 | | as necessary to administer this section and implement the |
---|
77 | 85 | | responsibilities of the work group. |
---|
78 | 86 | | (k) This Act expires and the work group is abolished June |
---|
79 | 87 | | 30, 2023. |
---|
80 | 88 | | SECTION 2. As soon as practicable, but not later than |
---|
81 | 89 | | October 1, 2021, the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of |
---|
82 | 90 | | the house of representatives shall appoint the members of the work |
---|
83 | 91 | | group on blockchain matters established by this Act. |
---|
84 | 92 | | SECTION 3. Not later than November 1, 2021, the work group |
---|
85 | 93 | | on blockchain matters shall hold its initial meeting. |
---|
86 | 94 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
87 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
88 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
89 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1576 was passed by the House on April |
---|
90 | | - | 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 126, Nays 20, 2 present, not |
---|
91 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
92 | | - | No. 1576 on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 10, |
---|
93 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
94 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
95 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
96 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1576 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
97 | | - | amendments, on May 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
98 | | - | 0. |
---|
99 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
100 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
101 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
102 | | - | Date |
---|
103 | | - | __________________ |
---|
104 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 95 | + | * * * * * |
---|