Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1576 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021
Fiscal Note March 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021