Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1603 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 1603
1+By: Huberty, Spiller H.B. No. 1603
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Seliger, et al.)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2021;
4+ April 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
5+ Education; May 10, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
6+ Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 10, 2021, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
28
39
10+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
411 AN ACT
512 relating to the use of individual graduation committees and other
613 alternative methods to satisfy certain public high school
714 graduation requirements.
815 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
916 SECTION 1. Sections 12.104(b-2) and (b-3), Education Code,
1017 are amended to read as follows:
1118 (b-2) An open-enrollment charter school is subject to the
1219 requirement to establish an individual graduation committee under
1320 Section 28.0258. [This subsection expires September 1, 2023.]
1421 (b-3) An open-enrollment charter school is subject to the
1522 graduation qualification procedure established by the commissioner
1623 under Section 28.02541. [This subsection expires September 1,
1724 2023.]
1825 SECTION 2. Section 28.025(c-6), Education Code, is amended
1926 to read as follows:
2027 (c-6) Notwithstanding Subsection (c), a person may receive
2128 a diploma if the person is eligible for a diploma under Section
2229 28.0258. [This subsection expires September 1, 2023.]
2330 SECTION 3. Section 28.02591(a), Education Code, is amended
2431 to read as follows:
2532 (a) The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board, in
2633 coordination with the agency, shall collect longitudinal data
2734 relating to the post-graduation pursuits of each student who is
2835 awarded a diploma based on the determination of an individual
2936 graduation committee under Section 28.0258, [as that section
3037 existed before September 1, 2023,] including whether the student:
3138 (1) enters the workforce;
3239 (2) enrolls in an associate degree or certificate
3340 program at a public or private institution of higher education;
3441 (3) enrolls in a bachelor's degree program at a public
3542 or private institution of higher education; or
3643 (4) enlists in the armed forces of the United States or
3744 the Texas National Guard.
3845 SECTION 4. Sections 39.025(a-3) and (a-5), Education Code,
3946 are amended to read as follows:
4047 (a-3) A student who, after retaking an end-of-course
4148 assessment instrument for Algebra I or English II, has failed to
4249 perform satisfactorily as required by Subsection (a), but who
4350 receives a score of proficient on the Texas Success Initiative
4451 (TSI) diagnostic assessment for the corresponding subject for which
4552 the student failed to perform satisfactorily on the end-of-course
4653 assessment instrument satisfies the requirement concerning the
4754 Algebra I or English II end-of-course assessment, as applicable.
4855 [This subsection expires September 1, 2023.]
4956 (a-5) Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a student who has
5057 failed to perform satisfactorily on end-of-course assessment
5158 instruments in the manner provided under this section may receive a
5259 high school diploma if the student has qualified for graduation
5360 under Section 28.0258. [This subsection expires September 1, 2023.]
54- SECTION 5. Section 39.057(a), Education Code, is amended to
55- read as follows:
56- (a) The commissioner may authorize special accreditation
57- investigations to be conducted:
58- (1) when excessive numbers of absences of students
59- eligible to be tested on state assessment instruments are
60- determined;
61- (2) when excessive numbers of allowable exemptions
62- from the required state assessment instruments are determined;
63- (3) in response to complaints submitted to the agency
64- with respect to alleged violations of civil rights or other
65- requirements imposed on the state by federal law or court order;
66- (4) in response to established compliance reviews of
67- the district's financial accounting practices and state and federal
68- program requirements;
69- (5) when extraordinary numbers of student placements
70- in disciplinary alternative education programs, other than
71- placements under Sections 37.006 and 37.007, are determined;
72- (6) in response to an allegation involving a conflict
73- between members of the board of trustees or between the board and
74- the district administration if it appears that the conflict
75- involves a violation of a role or duty of the board members or the
76- administration clearly defined by this code;
77- (7) when excessive numbers of students in special
78- education programs under Subchapter A, Chapter 29, are assessed
79- through assessment instruments developed or adopted under Section
80- 39.023(b);
81- (8) in response to an allegation regarding or an
82- analysis using a statistical method result indicating a possible
83- violation of an assessment instrument security procedure
84- established under Section 39.0301, including for the purpose of
85- investigating or auditing a school district under that section;
86- (9) when a significant pattern of decreased academic
87- performance has developed as a result of the promotion in the
88- preceding two school years of students who did not perform
89- satisfactorily as determined by the commissioner under Section
90- 39.0241(a) on assessment instruments administered under Section
91- 39.023(a), (c), or (l);
92- (10) when excessive numbers of students eligible to
93- enroll fail to complete an Algebra II course or any other advanced
94- course as determined by the commissioner;
95- (11) when resource allocation practices as evaluated
96- under Section 39.0821 indicate a potential for significant
97- improvement in resource allocation;
98- (12) when a disproportionate number of students of a
99- particular demographic group is graduating with a particular
100- endorsement under Section 28.025(c-1);
101- (13) when an excessive number of students is
102- graduating with a particular endorsement under Section
103- 28.025(c-1);
104- (14) in response to a complaint submitted to the
105- agency with respect to alleged inaccurate data that is reported
106- through the Public Education Information Management System (PEIMS)
107- or through other reports required by state or federal law or rule or
108- court order and that is used by the agency to make a determination
109- relating to public school accountability, including accreditation,
110- under this chapter;
111- (15) when 10 percent or more of the students
112- graduating in a particular school year from a particular high
113- school campus are awarded a diploma based on the determination of an
114- individual graduation committee under Section 28.0258;
115- (16) [(15)] when a school district for any reason
116- fails to produce, at the request of the agency, evidence or an
117- investigation report relating to an educator who is under
118- investigation by the State Board for Educator Certification; or
119- (17) [(16)] as the commissioner otherwise determines
120- necessary.
121- SECTION 6. Sections 28.02541(g), 28.0258(l), and
61+ SECTION 5. Sections 28.02541(g), 28.0258(l), and
12262 28.0259(e), Education Code, are repealed.
123- SECTION 7. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
63+ SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
12464 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
12565 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
12666 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
12767 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
128- ______________________________ ______________________________
129- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
130- I certify that H.B. No. 1603 was passed by the House on April
131- 13, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1 present, not
132- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
133- No. 1603 on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0,
134- 1 present, not voting.
135- ______________________________
136- Chief Clerk of the House
137- I certify that H.B. No. 1603 was passed by the Senate, with
138- amendments, on May 18, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
139- 1.
140- ______________________________
141- Secretary of the Senate
142- APPROVED: __________________
143- Date
144- __________________
145- Governor
68+ * * * * *