Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1603 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/24/2021

                            H.B. No. 1603


 AN ACT
 relating to the use of individual graduation committees and other
 alternative methods to satisfy certain public high school
 graduation requirements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 12.104(b-2) and (b-3), Education Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (b-2)  An open-enrollment charter school is subject to the
 requirement to establish an individual graduation committee under
 Section 28.0258. [This subsection expires September 1, 2023.]
 (b-3)  An open-enrollment charter school is subject to the
 graduation qualification procedure established by the commissioner
 under Section 28.02541. [This subsection expires September 1,
 2023.]
 SECTION 2.  Section 28.025(c-6), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c-6)  Notwithstanding Subsection (c), a person may receive
 a diploma if the person is eligible for a diploma under Section
 28.0258. [This subsection expires September 1, 2023.]
 SECTION 3.  Section 28.02591(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board, in
 coordination with the agency, shall collect longitudinal data
 relating to the post-graduation pursuits of each student who is
 awarded a diploma based on the determination of an individual
 graduation committee under Section 28.0258, [as that section
 existed before September 1, 2023,] including whether the student:
 (1)  enters the workforce;
 (2)  enrolls in an associate degree or certificate
 program at a public or private institution of higher education;
 (3)  enrolls in a bachelor's degree program at a public
 or private institution of higher education; or
 (4)  enlists in the armed forces of the United States or
 the Texas National Guard.
 SECTION 4.  Sections 39.025(a-3) and (a-5), Education Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a-3)  A student who, after retaking an end-of-course
 assessment instrument for Algebra I or English II, has failed to
 perform satisfactorily as required by Subsection (a), but who
 receives a score of proficient on the Texas Success Initiative
 (TSI) diagnostic assessment for the corresponding subject for which
 the student failed to perform satisfactorily on the end-of-course
 assessment instrument satisfies the requirement concerning the
 Algebra I or English II end-of-course assessment, as applicable.
 [This subsection expires September 1, 2023.]
 (a-5)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a student who has
 failed to perform satisfactorily on end-of-course assessment
 instruments in the manner provided under this section may receive a
 high school diploma if the student has qualified for graduation
 under Section 28.0258. [This subsection expires September 1, 2023.]
 SECTION 5.  Section 39.057(a), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The commissioner may authorize special accreditation
 investigations to be conducted:
 (1)  when excessive numbers of absences of students
 eligible to be tested on state assessment instruments are
 determined;
 (2)  when excessive numbers of allowable exemptions
 from the required state assessment instruments are determined;
 (3)  in response to complaints submitted to the agency
 with respect to alleged violations of civil rights or other
 requirements imposed on the state by federal law or court order;
 (4)  in response to established compliance reviews of
 the district's financial accounting practices and state and federal
 program requirements;
 (5)  when extraordinary numbers of student placements
 in disciplinary alternative education programs, other than
 placements under Sections 37.006 and 37.007, are determined;
 (6)  in response to an allegation involving a conflict
 between members of the board of trustees or between the board and
 the district administration if it appears that the conflict
 involves a violation of a role or duty of the board members or the
 administration clearly defined by this code;
 (7)  when excessive numbers of students in special
 education programs under Subchapter A, Chapter 29, are assessed
 through assessment instruments developed or adopted under Section
 39.023(b);
 (8)  in response to an allegation regarding or an
 analysis using a statistical method result indicating a possible
 violation of an assessment instrument security procedure
 established under Section 39.0301, including for the purpose of
 investigating or auditing a school district under that section;
 (9)  when a significant pattern of decreased academic
 performance has developed as a result of the promotion in the
 preceding two school years of students who did not perform
 satisfactorily as determined by the commissioner under Section
 39.0241(a) on assessment instruments administered under Section
 39.023(a), (c), or (l);
 (10)  when excessive numbers of students eligible to
 enroll fail to complete an Algebra II course or any other advanced
 course as determined by the commissioner;
 (11)  when resource allocation practices as evaluated
 under Section 39.0821 indicate a potential for significant
 improvement in resource allocation;
 (12)  when a disproportionate number of students of a
 particular demographic group is graduating with a particular
 endorsement under Section 28.025(c-1);
 (13)  when an excessive number of students is
 graduating with a particular endorsement under Section
 28.025(c-1);
 (14)  in response to a complaint submitted to the
 agency with respect to alleged inaccurate data that is reported
 through the Public Education Information Management System (PEIMS)
 or through other reports required by state or federal law or rule or
 court order and that is used by the agency to make a determination
 relating to public school accountability, including accreditation,
 under this chapter;
 (15)  when 10 percent or more of the students
 graduating in a particular school year from a particular high
 school campus are awarded a diploma based on the determination of an
 individual graduation committee under Section 28.0258;
 (16) [(15)]  when a school district for any reason
 fails to produce, at the request of the agency, evidence or an
 investigation report relating to an educator who is under
 investigation by the State Board for Educator Certification; or
 (17) [(16)]  as the commissioner otherwise determines
 necessary.
 SECTION 6.  Sections 28.02541(g), 28.0258(l), and
 28.0259(e), Education Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1603 was passed by the House on April
 13, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1603 on May 24, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 145, Nays 0,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1603 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 18, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays
 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor