Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1606 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021