Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1685 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/21/2021

                            By: Cortez (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 1685
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of an electronic recording device to report
 proceedings before a municipal court of record for the City of San
 Antonio.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 30.00226, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  Instead of using a court reporter to preserve a record
 in a case, the governing body may authorize the use of a good
 quality electronic recording device to report court proceedings. If
 the governing body authorizes an electronic recording, the court
 reporter is not required to be present to certify the reporter's
 record. The recording shall be kept for the 20-day period beginning
 the day after the last day of the court proceeding, trial, or denial
 of motion for new trial, whichever occurs last. If a case is
 appealed, the proceedings shall be transcribed from the recording
 by an official court reporter.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *