Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1694 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 9, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note March 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis April 8, 2021