Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1699 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2021
Bill April 5, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note March 28, 2021
Fiscal Note March 18, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 27, 2021
Analysis April 1, 2021