Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1728 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 14, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 23, 2021
Fiscal Note March 18, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 22, 2021
Analysis April 1, 2021