Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1729 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note May 6, 2021
Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Fiscal Note March 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 7, 2021
Analysis May 3, 2021
Analysis March 22, 2021