1 | | - | H.B. No. 1729 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Harris (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 1729 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 6, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Business & Commerce; May 10, 2021, reported adversely, with |
---|
| 5 | + | favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, |
---|
| 6 | + | Nays 0; May 10, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1729 By: Hancock |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the sale of alcoholic beverages in areas annexed by |
---|
6 | 14 | | certain municipalities. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 251.72, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is |
---|
9 | 17 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | Sec. 251.72. CHANGE OF STATUS. Except as provided in |
---|
11 | 19 | | Sections 251.725, 251.726, 251.727, 251.73, and 251.80, an |
---|
12 | 20 | | authorized voting unit that has exercised or may exercise the right |
---|
13 | 21 | | of local option retains the status adopted, whether absolute |
---|
14 | 22 | | prohibition or legalization of the sale of alcoholic beverages of |
---|
15 | 23 | | one or more of the various types and alcoholic contents on which an |
---|
16 | 24 | | issue may be submitted under the terms of Section 501.035, Election |
---|
17 | 25 | | Code, until that status is changed by a subsequent local option |
---|
18 | 26 | | election in the same authorized voting unit. |
---|
19 | 27 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter D, Chapter 251, Alcoholic Beverage |
---|
20 | 28 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 251.727 to read as follows: |
---|
21 | 29 | | Sec. 251.727. CHANGE OF STATUS FOR TERRITORY ANNEXED BY |
---|
22 | 30 | | MUNICIPALITIES IN CERTAIN COUNTIES. (a) This section applies only |
---|
23 | 31 | | to: |
---|
24 | 32 | | (1) a municipality that contains U.S. Highway 287 and |
---|
25 | 33 | | State Highway 294 and is located in a county with a population of |
---|
26 | 34 | | not less than 57,000 and not more than 59,000 on September 1, 2021; |
---|
27 | 35 | | or |
---|
28 | 36 | | (2) a municipality that: |
---|
29 | 37 | | (A) has a municipal boundary located not more |
---|
30 | 38 | | than 1.5 miles from an automobile racetrack with a seating capacity |
---|
31 | 39 | | of more than 100,000; |
---|
32 | 40 | | (B) has a population of more than 1,000 and less |
---|
33 | 41 | | than 3,000; and |
---|
34 | 42 | | (C) is located entirely within a county with a |
---|
35 | 43 | | population of more than 650,000 that is adjacent to two counties, |
---|
36 | 44 | | each of which has a population of more than 1.8 million. |
---|
37 | 45 | | (b) Notwithstanding any other law, an area annexed to a |
---|
38 | 46 | | municipality to which this section applies automatically assumes |
---|
39 | 47 | | the wet or dry status of that municipality on annexation. |
---|
40 | 48 | | SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies to an |
---|
41 | 49 | | area annexed by a municipality before, on, or after the effective |
---|
42 | 50 | | date of this Act. |
---|
43 | 51 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
44 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
45 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
46 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1729 was passed by the House on April |
---|
47 | | - | 1, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
48 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
49 | | - | No. 1729 on May 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, |
---|
50 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
51 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
52 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
53 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1729 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
54 | | - | amendments, on May 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
55 | | - | 0. |
---|
56 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
58 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
59 | | - | Date |
---|
60 | | - | __________________ |
---|
61 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 52 | + | * * * * * |
---|