House | 05/12/2021 | Postponed 11/7/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Point of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 1(d) | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Filed |