Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1792 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 14, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021
Bill April 7, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 3, 2021
Analysis April 7, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021
Fiscal Note March 23, 2021