Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1861 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021