Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1861 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/22/2021

                            By: Cortez (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 1861
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2021;
 May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 22, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirements for interlocal contracts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 791.011(d), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (d)  An interlocal contract must:
 (1)  be authorized by the governing body of each party
 to the contract unless a party to the contract is a water utility
 owned by a municipality containing more than 75 percent of the
 population of a county with a population of 1.5 million or more or a
 municipally owned electric utility, in which event the governing
 body may establish procedures for entering into interlocal
 contracts that do not exceed $100,000 without requiring the
 approval of the governing body;
 (2)  state the purpose, terms, rights, and duties of
 the contracting parties; and
 (3)  specify that each party paying for the performance
 of governmental functions or services must make those payments from
 current revenues available to the paying party.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an interlocal contract entered into on or after the effective date
 of this Act. An interlocal contract entered into before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the contract was entered into, and the former law is continued
 in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *