|
06/15/2021
|
Effective on 9/1/21
|
|
|
|
06/15/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/01/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Record vote RV#1736
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House appoints conferees with instructions
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Motion prevails
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Motion to instruct conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Record vote RV#770
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Amended 9-C. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Record vote RV#769
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 8-C. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Amended 7-Herrero and Hunter
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Amended 6-Lozano
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Record vote RV#768
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 5-Bowers, Ramos, Crockett, Rose, J.E. Johnson, Davis, Meza, Neave, and Anchia
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Amended 4-Ordaz Perez, Ortega, Fierro, Moody, and M. González
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Amended 3-Rodriguez, Goodwin, Cole, Israel, Hinojosa, and Howard
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Amendment adopted as amended 1-Cyrier
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Amendment amended 2-Vasut and E. Thompson
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-Cyrier
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Postponed 5/5/21 12:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Amended 3-Martinez Fischer, Cortez, Pacheco, Gervin-Hawkins, Minjarez, Larson, Lopez, Campos, Allison, More
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Amended 2-Moody
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Amended 1-Cyrier
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Postponed 5/4/21 2:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Postponed 5/4/21 1:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|