Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1869 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            H.B. No. 1869


 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of debt for the purposes of calculating
 certain ad valorem tax rates of a taxing unit.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 26.012, Tax Code, is amended by amending
 Subdivision (7) and adding Subdivisions (9), (18-a), and (18-b) to
 read as follows:
 (7)  "Debt" means:
 (A)  a bond, warrant, certificate of obligation,
 or other evidence of indebtedness owed by a taxing unit that:
 (i)  is payable [solely] from property taxes
 in installments over a period of more than one year, not budgeted
 for payment from maintenance and operations funds, and secured by a
 pledge of property taxes; and
 (ii)  meets one of the following
 requirements:
 (a)  has been approved at an election;
 (b)  includes self-supporting debt;
 (c)  evidences a loan under a state or
 federal financial assistance program;
 (d)  is issued for designated
 infrastructure;
 (e)  is a refunding bond;
 (f)  is issued in response to an
 emergency under Section 1431.015, Government Code;
 (g)  is issued for renovating,
 improving, or equipping existing buildings or facilities;
 (h)  is issued for vehicles or
 equipment; or
 (i)  is issued for a project under
 Chapter 311, Tax Code, or Chapter 222, Transportation Code, that is
 located in a reinvestment zone created under one of those
 chapters;[,] or
 (B)  a payment made under contract to secure
 indebtedness of a similar nature issued by another political
 subdivision on behalf of the taxing unit.
 (9)  "Designated infrastructure" means infrastructure,
 including a facility, equipment, rights-of-way, or land, for the
 following purposes:
 (A)  streets, roads, highways, bridges,
 sidewalks, parks, landfills, parking structures, or airports;
 (B)  telecommunications, wireless
 communications, information technology systems, applications,
 hardware, or software;
 (C)  cybersecurity;
 (D)  as part of any utility system, water supply
 project, water plant, wastewater plant, water and wastewater
 distribution or conveyance facility, wharf, dock, or flood control
 and drainage project;
 (E)  police stations, fire stations, or other
 public safety facilities, jails, juvenile detention facilities, or
 judicial facilities, and any facilities that are physically
 attached to the facilities described by this paragraph;
 (F)  as part of any school district; or
 (G)  as part of any hospital district created by
 general or special law that includes a teaching hospital.
 (18-a)  "Refunding bond" means a bond or other
 obligation issued for refunding or refinancing purposes under
 Chapter 1207 or 1371, Government Code.
 (18-b)  "Self-supporting debt" means the portion of a
 bond, warrant, certificate of obligation, or other evidence of
 indebtedness described by Subdivision (7)(A)(i) designated by the
 governing body of a political subdivision as being repaid from a
 source other than property taxes.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a bond, warrant, certificate of obligation, or other evidence of
 indebtedness for which the ordinance, order, or resolution
 authorizing the issuance is adopted by the governing body of a
 taxing unit on or after the effective date of this Act and for which
 the taxing unit has not entered into a binding agreement before the
 effective date of this Act that contemplates the issuance of the
 debt. The changes in law made by this Act do not apply to a bond,
 warrant, certificate of obligation, or other evidence of
 indebtedness for which the ordinance, order, or resolution
 authorizing the issuance was adopted by the governing body of a
 taxing unit before the effective date of this Act or for which the
 taxing unit has entered into a binding agreement before the
 effective date of this Act that contemplates the issuance of such
 debt, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 For the purposes of this section, "binding agreement" includes a
 development agreement, ordinance, order, or resolution that
 authorizes or delegates to an appropriate officer of a taxing unit
 the execution of a binding agreement at a later date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1869 was passed by the House on May 5,
 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 111, Nays 29, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 1869 on May 28, 2021, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 1869 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 72,
 Nays 67, 3 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1869 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 20, Nays
 10, 1 present, not voting; at the request of the House, the Senate
 appointed a conference committee to consider the differences
 between the two houses; and that the Senate adopted the conference
 committee report on H.B. No. 1869 on May 29, 2021, by the following
 vote:  Yeas 20, Nays 10, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor