Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1885 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 7, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 7, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 31, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021