|
06/01/2021
|
Effective on 9/1/21
|
|
|
|
06/01/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/01/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Record vote RV#1603
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Hinojosa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Hinojosa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hinojosa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Record vote RV#847
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Record vote RV#846
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 3-Wu
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Record vote RV#845
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 2-Wu
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Record vote RV#844
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 1-Wu
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 1(a)(1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Record vote RV#837
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Amended 9-Herrero
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Record vote RV#836
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 8-Cole
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Record vote RV#835
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 7-Martinez Fischer
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Record vote RV#834
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 6-J.D. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 5-J.D. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 4-J.D. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Record vote RV#833
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Amended 2-Goldman
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 3-Dutton
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Amended 1-Goldman
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 5-J.D. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 5-J.D. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 4-Rodriguez
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Record vote RV#560
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 2-Rodriguez
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 1(b)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|