Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1900 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 7, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 9, 2021
Fiscal Note March 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021