Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1904 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis April 1, 2021