LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2021 - 87th Regular
House
Bills
HB1906
Draft Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB1906
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2021 - 87th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1906
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 12, 2021
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 16, 2021
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 27, 2021
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
May 21, 2021
Compare
Fiscal Note
Fiscal Note
May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note
March 31, 2021
Analysis
Analysis
May 18, 2021
Analysis
April 12, 2021