|
06/15/2021
|
Effective on 9/1/21
|
|
|
|
06/15/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Record vote RV#1560
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Schwertner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Buckingham
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Record vote RV#791
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Record vote RV#775
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Record vote RV#774
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 7-Pacheco
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Record vote RV#773
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 6-Gervin-Hawkins
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Amended 5-Moody and Collier
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Amended 4-Bernal and S. Thompson
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Amended 3-J. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Amendment adopted as amended 1-Capriglione
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Amendment amended 2-J. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-Capriglione
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 18(b), and Rule 4, Section 32(b)(10)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Record vote RV#427
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 12-Dutton
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Record vote RV#426
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 11-Dutton
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Record vote RV#425
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 10-Crockett
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Record vote RV#424
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 9-Crockett
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 8-Goodwin
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Amended 7-Bernal and S. Thompson
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Amended 6-J. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Record vote RV#423
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 5-Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Amended 4-Moody and Collier
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Postponed 4/26/21 2:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Amended 3-Capriglione
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 2-Capriglione
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Amended 2-Capriglione
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 1-Capriglione
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|