Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1925 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 23, 2021
Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note March 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021