Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Record vote RV#436
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Amended 1-Rose
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2020
|
Filed
|
|
|