Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB193 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/21/2021

                            By: Rose (Senate Sponsor - Blanco) H.B. No. 193
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2021;
 May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to juvenile court records of victims of sex trafficking.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 54, Family Code, is amended by adding
 Section 54.12 to read as follows:
 Sec. 54.12.  TRAFFICKING VICTIM FINDING. (a) This section
 applies to a child who was referred to a juvenile probation
 department and whose records include conduct:
 (1)  that constitutes an offense under Section
 43.02(a), Penal Code; and
 (2)  for which the defense under Section 43.02(d),
 Penal Code, applies.
 (b)  If applicable, the court shall enter a finding in the
 case of a child to whom this section applies stating that the child
 is a victim of trafficking.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C-1, Chapter 58, Family Code, is
 amended by adding Section 58.2552 to read as follows:
 Sec. 58.2552.  SEALING RECORDS WITH OR WITHOUT APPLICATION:
 TRAFFICKING VICTIM. (a) If a juvenile court enters a finding that a
 child is a victim of trafficking under Section 54.12, the court, on
 the court's own motion and without a hearing, shall immediately
 order the sealing of all records of the child that are related to
 the conduct described under that section.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a child who is entitled
 to have records sealed under that subsection may file an
 application for the sealing of records related to the child's
 applicable conduct in the juvenile court served by the juvenile
 probation department to which the child was referred. The court may
 not charge a fee for filing the application, regardless of the form
 of the application. An application filed under this subsection
 must include the information required under Section 58.256(b).
 (c)  On receipt of an application under Subsection (b), the
 court shall immediately order the sealing of the child's records
 related to the applicable conduct without a hearing.
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies to juvenile court records
 created before, on, or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *