House | 05/12/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Referred to Insurance | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 02/16/2021 | Filed |