Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1935 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 25, 2021
Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 29, 2021