1 | | - | H.B. No. 1935 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Bucy, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 1935 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
| 4 | + | Human Services; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following |
---|
| 5 | + | vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to emergency refills of insulin and insulin-related |
---|
6 | 12 | | equipment or supplies. |
---|
7 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 562, Occupations Code, is |
---|
9 | 15 | | amended by adding Section 562.0541 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 16 | | Sec. 562.0541. EMERGENCY REFILLS OF INSULIN AND |
---|
11 | 17 | | INSULIN-RELATED EQUIPMENT OR SUPPLIES. (a) In this section: |
---|
12 | 18 | | (1) "Insulin" includes an insulin analog and an |
---|
13 | 19 | | insulin-like medication, regardless of the activation period or |
---|
14 | 20 | | whether the solution is mixed before the prescription is dispensed. |
---|
15 | 21 | | (2) "Insulin-related equipment or supplies" includes |
---|
16 | 22 | | needles, syringes, cartridge systems, prefilled pen systems, |
---|
19 | 24 | | (b) A pharmacist may provide an emergency refill of insulin |
---|
20 | 25 | | or insulin-related equipment or supplies if the pharmacist complies |
---|
21 | 26 | | with this section and rules adopted under this section. |
---|
22 | 27 | | (c) Notwithstanding Section 562.054(a) and subject to |
---|
23 | 28 | | Subsection (b) of this section, a pharmacist may exercise the |
---|
24 | 29 | | pharmacist's professional judgment in refilling a prescription for |
---|
25 | 30 | | insulin or insulin-related equipment or supplies without the |
---|
26 | 31 | | authorization of the prescribing practitioner if the pharmacist: |
---|
27 | 32 | | (1) is unable to contact the practitioner after |
---|
28 | 33 | | reasonable effort; |
---|
29 | 34 | | (2) is provided with documentation showing that the |
---|
30 | 35 | | patient was previously prescribed insulin or insulin-related |
---|
31 | 36 | | equipment or supplies by a practitioner; |
---|
32 | 37 | | (3) assesses the patient to determine whether the |
---|
33 | 38 | | emergency refill is appropriate; |
---|
34 | 39 | | (4) creates a record that documents the patient's |
---|
35 | 40 | | visit that includes a notation describing the documentation |
---|
36 | 41 | | provided under Subdivision (2); and |
---|
37 | 42 | | (5) makes a reasonable attempt to inform the |
---|
38 | 43 | | practitioner of the emergency refill at the earliest reasonable |
---|
39 | 44 | | time. |
---|
40 | 45 | | (d) The quantity of an emergency refill of insulin may not |
---|
41 | 46 | | exceed a 30-day supply. The quantity of an emergency refill of |
---|
42 | 47 | | insulin-related equipment or supplies may not exceed the lesser of |
---|
43 | 48 | | a 30-day supply or the smallest available package. |
---|
44 | 49 | | (e) The prescribing practitioner is not liable for an act or |
---|
45 | 50 | | omission by a pharmacist in dispensing an emergency refill of |
---|
46 | 51 | | insulin or insulin-related equipment or supplies under this |
---|
47 | 52 | | section. |
---|
48 | 53 | | SECTION 2. Section 1358.054, Insurance Code, is amended by |
---|
49 | 54 | | adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows: |
---|
50 | 55 | | (a-1) A health benefit plan described by Subsection (a) must |
---|
51 | 56 | | provide to each qualified enrollee coverage for emergency refills |
---|
52 | 57 | | of diabetes equipment or diabetes supplies dispensed to the |
---|
53 | 58 | | enrollee in accordance with Section 562.0541, Occupations Code, in |
---|
54 | 59 | | the same manner as for a nonemergency refill of diabetes equipment |
---|
55 | 60 | | or diabetes supplies. |
---|
56 | 61 | | SECTION 3. As soon as practicable after the effective date |
---|
57 | 62 | | of this Act, the Texas State Board of Pharmacy shall adopt rules |
---|
58 | 63 | | necessary to implement Section 562.0541, Occupations Code, as added |
---|
59 | 64 | | by this Act. |
---|
60 | 65 | | SECTION 4. Section 1358.054, Insurance Code, as amended by |
---|
61 | 66 | | this Act, applies only to a health benefit plan that is delivered, |
---|
62 | 67 | | issued for delivery, or renewed on or after January 1, 2022. |
---|
63 | 68 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
64 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
65 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
66 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1935 was passed by the House on May |
---|
67 | | - | 11, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 131, Nays 12, 2 present, not |
---|
68 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
69 | | - | No. 1935 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 1, |
---|
70 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
71 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
72 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
73 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1935 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
74 | | - | amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
75 | | - | 0. |
---|
76 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
77 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
78 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
79 | | - | Date |
---|
80 | | - | __________________ |
---|
81 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 69 | + | * * * * * |
---|