Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1957 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2021
Bill March 31, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis March 31, 2021