1 | | - | H.B. No. 1957 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Kuempel, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 1957 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & |
---|
| 4 | + | Commerce; May 12, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
| 5 | + | Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 12, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to the labeling of wine as originating from an area of this |
---|
6 | 12 | | state or with the name of a vineyard in this state. |
---|
7 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 101, Alcoholic Beverage |
---|
9 | 15 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 101.673 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 16 | | Sec. 101.673. USE OF AMERICAN VITICULTURAL AREA, COUNTY, OR |
---|
11 | 17 | | VINEYARD ON WINE LABEL. (a) In this section, "American |
---|
12 | 18 | | viticultural area" has the meaning assigned by 27 C.F.R. Section |
---|
13 | 19 | | 4.25. |
---|
14 | 20 | | (b) A wine that is otherwise entitled under federal law to |
---|
15 | 21 | | an appellation of origin indicating the wine's origin is an |
---|
16 | 22 | | American viticultural area or county located in this state may use |
---|
17 | 23 | | that appellation only if the wine is 100 percent by volume fermented |
---|
18 | 24 | | juice of grapes or other fruit grown in this state. |
---|
19 | 25 | | (c) A wine that is otherwise entitled under federal law to |
---|
20 | 26 | | use the name of a specific vineyard in this state on the wine's |
---|
21 | 27 | | label may use the name of the vineyard on the label only if the wine |
---|
22 | 28 | | is 100 percent by volume fermented juice of grapes or other fruit |
---|
23 | 29 | | grown in this state. |
---|
24 | 30 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
25 | 31 | | to a wine made from grapes or other fruit harvested on or after |
---|
26 | 32 | | January 1, 2022. |
---|
27 | 33 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
28 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
29 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
30 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1957 was passed by the House on April |
---|
31 | | - | 9, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 123, Nays 21, 2 present, not |
---|
32 | | - | voting. |
---|
33 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
34 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
35 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1957 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
36 | | - | 14, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1. |
---|
37 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
38 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
39 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
40 | | - | Date |
---|
41 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
42 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 34 | + | * * * * * |
---|