Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1964 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/19/2021

                            87R8188 MCK-D
 By: Lopez H.B. No. 1964


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study on the cost of providing quality child care in
 this state in comparison to family income.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 301, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 301.0701 to read as follows:
 Sec. 301.0701.  CHILD-CARE STUDY.  (a) The commission shall
 conduct a study in this state regarding the cost, in comparison to
 family income, of providing child care that meets at least the
 minimum quality requirements for certification as a three-star
 rating provider under the Texas Rising Star Program. The study
 must:
 (1)  examine statewide and for each local workforce
 development area the:
 (A)  trends in the current costs and projections
 for future costs of providing quality child care;
 (B)  costs of providing quality child care in
 comparison to family income based on federal poverty guidelines,
 state median household incomes, or other relevant income standards;
 (C)  amount or estimated amount of governmental
 money available to support subsidized child care over the periods
 used for the data described in Paragraphs (A) and (B) and the number
 of children receiving subsidized child care; and
 (D)  cost of providing quality child care in
 comparison to the reimbursement rate for subsidized child care and
 the market rate for providing that level of care; and
 (2)  estimate the number of families eligible to
 receive subsidized child care.
 (b)  In conducting the study under Subsection (a), the
 commission shall include the following expenses when calculating
 the cost of providing the quality child care described by that
 subsection:
 (1)  the salary and benefits, including insurance, for
 the employees of the child-care facility;
 (2)  the facility's operating costs, including any rent
 or mortgage, utility expenses, insurance, and building
 maintenance;
 (3)  the costs for computer equipment, software, and
 other technology needed to operate the facility;
 (4)  any costs incurred in obtaining certification
 under the Texas Rising Star Program, including any certification or
 assessment fees;
 (5)  the license fees needed to operate the facility;
 and
 (6)  any other expense the commission considers is
 necessary to provide the quality child care described by Subsection
 (a).
 (c)  Not later than December 15, 2022, the commission shall
 report the results of the study conducted under Subsection (a) to
 the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, and each legislative standing committee with
 jurisdiction over child-care facilities.
 (d)  Not later than December 15, 2024, the commission shall
 update the study results and provide the update to the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives,
 and each legislative standing committee with jurisdiction over
 child-care facilities.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2025.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.