Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1966 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 18, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis May 3, 2021